THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:30:55 PM
Ryan, Gregory Charles Edmond Harold
CPSO#:
53249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Gaelic, German
Education: National University of Ireland, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
OPG 3-906
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8415
Fax: (416) 586-8617
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Greg Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 19 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY CHARLES EDMOND HAROLD RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1987 |