THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:48:19 AM
Swierczek, Janusz Stefan
CPSO#:
53218
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
07 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
7-Jan-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Swierczek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact Aberfoyle Clinic - 1 Eva Rd #406, Etobicoke, ON M9C 4Z5, (416) 231-7968
Date Received: 29 Jul 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 07 Jan 2021 |