THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:50:25 AM
Fairbrother, Joseph
CPSO#:
53209
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Southampton, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Fairbrother Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:WOHS
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging,
2100 Bovaird Dr. East,
Brampton, ON
L6R 3J7
Date Received: 09 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 May 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2022 |