THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:28:11 PM
Cripps, John Robert
CPSO#:
53166
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.R. Cripps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical records can contact: RSRS 1-888-563-3732, Fax: 416-398-5932
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1X6
Date Received: 09 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2019 |