THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:17:47 AM
Thomson, John George
CPSO#:
53139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite B-2
194 Main Street
Ottawa ON K1S 1C2
Phone: (613) 232-2814
Fax: (613) 232-2779
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:26 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1985 |