THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:02:13 AM
Muirhead, Norman
CPSO#:
53103
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Norman Muirhead Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Muirhead Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 15 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jul 2021 |