THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:37:43 PM
Karsh, Jacob
CPSO#:
53098
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Arthritis Centre
Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jacob Karsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:all medical records are part of patient's Ottawa Hospital chart and may be obtained through Medical Records Department of The Ottawa Hospital.
Date Received: 01 May 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:29 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACOB KARSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 May 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |