THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:58:09 AM
Marcellus, Deborah Caryn
CPSO#:
53094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Not In Practice
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH CARYN MARCELLUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCELLUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 31 May 1982 to 11 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1988 |