THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:01:24 PM
McFadden, Robin Garfield
CPSO#:
53084
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robin McFadden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 16 Aug 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2016 |