THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:58:16 AM
Opper, David Brian
CPSO#:
53082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Fieldstone Cir
Brantford ON N3R 6S7
Phone: (519) 751-4108
Fax: (519) 751-4108
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 24 Feb 2015 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 25 Feb 2015 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 25 May 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Discipline Committee |
Effective: 24 Feb 2015 |
|
Active |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Feb 2015
Summary:
On February 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Opper committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, and that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Opper admitted to the allegations.
On August 9, 2011, Dr. Opper was charged with and on October 25, 2012, pleaded guilty and was found guilty of the following offences under s.44(1)(a) of the Health Insurance Act:
(a) Failing to maintain records as may be necessary to demonstrate that a service for which he prepares or submits an account is the service that he provided. Dr. Opper was compensated for improper billings in the amount of $29,767.50 for the period of April 1, 2009 to March 31, 2010.
(b) Knowingly obtaining or attempting to obtain payment for any insured service that he was not entitled to obtain. Dr. Opper billed OHIP for services purportedly provided to a patient in December 2006 and July 2009. The patient denied having seen Dr. Opper at any time after June 2006, and Dr. Opper later admitted to not having provided the services to the patient. Dr. Opper received $265.30 for these billings.
(c) Knowingly giving false information in an application, return or statement made to the Plan or to the General Manager. Dr. Opper billed OHIP for services purportedly provided to a patient in July 2009. The patient denied having received services from Dr. Opper at any time after 2006, and Dr. Opper later admitted to knowingly giving false information to OHIP regarding the provision of insured services to this patient. Dr. Opper received $206.90 for this billing.
In addition, Dr. Opper agreed to facts, though he did not plead guilty to the associated counts, regarding billing OHIP for 17 Special Visit Premiums related to discussions with a colleague regarding the colleague’s personal medical issues and 11 Special Visit Premiums related to discussions with a member of his church.
In relation to the three charges of which he was found guilty, Dr. Opper was sentenced to a fine of $30,000 ($10,000 per count), plus court costs and victim surcharge. On October 25, 2012, prior to the hearing on the charges, Dr. Opper paid restitution in the amount of $29,816.20.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Opper’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing at 12:01 a.m. on February 25, 2015.
- the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Opper’s certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. Opper shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program satisfactory to the College in Ethics, with a report or reports to be provided to the College regarding Dr. Opper’s progress and compliance. Dr. Opper shall complete this requirement by August 1, 2015 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter;
(ii) Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Opper shall obtain a physician practice monitor acceptable to the College, who will review his Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) billings and corresponding patient charts to ensure his compliance with the Health Insurance Act and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule “A” (the “Practice Monitor”);
(iii) The Practice Monitor will review, at minimum, 25 of Dr. Opper’s patient charts for which he has billed OHIP once every three (3) months for a minimum of one year. If Dr. Opper bills OHIP for fewer than 25 patients in any given three-month period, the Practice Monitor will review all of the patient charts for which Dr. Opper billed OHIP. In the event that Dr. Opper has billed OHIP for fewer than 100 patients during the one-year period of monitoring, the monitoring will continue until a minimum of 100 charts have been reviewed;
(iv) If a Practice Monitor who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Opper shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time; (v) If Dr. Opper is unable to obtain a Practice Monitor in accordance with paragraphs 4(ii), 4(iii) and 4(iv) of this Order, he shall cease to submit bills to OHIP until such time as he has done so;
(vi) Dr. Opper shall consent to the disclosure by his Practice Monitor to the College, and by the College to his Practice Monitor, of all information the Practice Monitor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Practice Monitor’s undertaking and to monitor Dr. Opper’s compliance with this Order;
(vii) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Opper shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices including, but not limited to hospitals, clinics, and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that location;
(viii) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Opper shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order;
(ix) Dr. Opper shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and cooperate with inspections of his practice and patient charts by his Practice Monitor and College representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; and
(x) Dr. Opper shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of this Order.
- Dr. Opper appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Opper pay its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 24, 2015