THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:57:48 PM
Afshari-Azad, Nahid
CPSO#:
53081
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Azad-Sabour, Nahid Afshari (used until: 15 Dec 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2024 |