THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:55:27 PM
Gertler, Stanley
CPSO#:
53066
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stan Gertler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:05 Dec 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |