THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:45:39 AM
Comeau, Byron Keith
CPSO#:
53063
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7899 McLaughlin Rd
Brampton ON L6Y 5H9
Phone: 905-459-7533 Ext. 5153
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BYRON KEITH COMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMEAU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1984 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 09 Oct 2001 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 09 Jan 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2000
Summary:
On August 30, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Comeau(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.
On July 9, 2001, the Committee also ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Comeau be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the register.
2. Dr. Comeau(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of twelve months to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar; however, nine (9) of these months shall be suspended provided that:
a) he continue in a therapeutic relationship with his current treating psychiatrist or a psychiatrist acceptable to the College;
b) he sees his psychiatrist at least on a quarterly basis;
c) his psychiatrist provide to the College a written report annually (by the end of August in each year) until August, 2006, commenting on his current medical status, including any psychiatric concerns relating to his suitability to practice;
d) Dr. Comeau pay the costs for such reports;
e) Dr. Comeau reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient for counselling and therapy not covered by OHIP, and that he provide a letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, for a period of 5 years, in the amount of $10,000, to guarantee the payment of any amounts that may be so required.
Finally, in the event that any of the above conditions not be met then the Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Comeau(s Certificate of Registration for the remaining nine months of the suspension ordered.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-03-28
Hearing Date(s): Aug 30, 2000