THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:21:52 AM
Newell, Paul Robert
CPSO#:
53052
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
23 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Newell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jan 2015 |