THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:59:12 PM
Batten, Adrian Paul
CPSO#:
53037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Laboratories
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 3900
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIAN PAUL BATTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 1989 |