THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:06:43 AM
White, Gail Maureen Carleton
CPSO#:
53009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Effective Sept 1, 2021
RSRS
111 St Regis Cr S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
416 938 0638
Date Received: 08 Jul 2021
Instructions/Address:copy of
any scanned paper charts effective Sept 1,2021 to:
Santd Alliance Health on Hunt Club
885 Meadowlands Dr. East, Unit 15
Ottawa, ON, K2C 3N2
Tel:613.801.3380 Fax: 613.801.4380
www.AllianceHealthOHC.ca
paper charts prior to May 1, 2014
available at:
RSRS-Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S,
North York, ON, M3J1 Y6
tel: 413.938.0638
Date Received: 28 Jun 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAIL MAUREEN CARLETON WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1985 |