THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:30:17 AM
Feagan, Brian Gordon
CPSO#:
52987
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Dundas St
Alimentiv Inc.
Suite 200
London ON N6A 5B6
Phone: 5196737400
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN GORDON FEAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEAGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Apr 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1988 |