THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:42:14 PM
De Lorenzi, Claudio
CPSO#:
52985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
DeLorenzi Clinic
150 Edna Street
Kitchener ON N2H 6S1
Phone: (519) 570-2811
Fax: (519) 744-1461
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIO DE LORENZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LORENZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1989 to 01 Apr 1989
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1984 |