THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:41:36 PM
Silverman, Mark Steven
CPSO#:
52976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 502
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 422-5755
Fax: (343) 888-2596
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1993 |