THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:07:19 PM
Sitwell, Lucian Donald
CPSO#:
52975
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 739-7268
Fax: (613) 739-7023
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUCIAN DONALD SITWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1987 |