THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:03:11 AM
Trudel, Jean-Rene
CPSO#:
52971
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Rene Trudel Societe Professionnelle De Medecine
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
45 Oasis PVT
Ottawa, ON K1K 4X8
Date Received: 13 Nov 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Nov 2020 |