THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 3:49:48 AM
Mantynen, Philip Russell
CPSO#:
52945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3-246 Dundas St S
Cambridge ON N1R 8A8
Phone: 519-620-3600
Fax: 519-623-2662
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. Mantynen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP RUSSELL MANTYNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTYNEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2000 |