THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:50:33 AM
Tittley, Jacques
CPSO#:
52938
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton ST. East
5 North Suite 508
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44499
Fax: (905) 521-1284
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUES TITTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TITTLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1984 |