THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:59:08 PM
Houlden, Robyn Leslie
CPSO#:
52937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3 Room 4 - 3-225
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1379
Fax: (613) 548-6105
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:08 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBYN LESLIE HOULDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOULDEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1986 |