THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:48:21 PM
Richards, Robert Stanley
CPSO#:
52929
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Cherryhill Blvd
Feel Better Wellness
London ON N6H 4S4
Phone: 5486899976
Fax: 5192869382
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 9, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 9, 2023, London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph's Health Centre (London) (the “Hospitals”) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that Dr. Robert Richards’ privileges were suspended effective May 27, 2023. The Hospitals also noted that effective May 29, 2023, Dr. Richards resigned from hospital practice.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT STANLEY RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1991 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 16, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Robert Richards was charged with the following offence:
1. 2 counts of Sexual assault, between January 1, 2010 and January 20, 2023 contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: August 16, 2023
Place of Charge: London, Ontario
London Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 11, 2023, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Robert Richards:
1. Richards must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with a named person.
2. Richards must not attend within 200 meters of any known place of residence, education or employment of a named person.
3. Richards must not attend within 25 meters of a named person.