THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:19:53 AM
Colman, Laurence David
CPSO#:
52916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
c/o William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd.
Toronto ON M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 559 9685
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 20, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On September 22, 2011, William Osler Health System notified the College that Dr. Laurence David Colman's privileges were suspended effective September 20, 2011.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 16, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:
Notice received by the College from William Osler Health Centre of suspension of Dr. Lawrence D. Colman's privileges from June 16, 2009 to March 3, 2010.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 30 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 30 May 2014 |
|
Active |