THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:06:37 PM
Blacklock, Elaine Gloria
CPSO#:
52886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 18 Nov 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELAINE GLORIA BLACKLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKLOCK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 1994 |