THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:30:39 PM
Warren, Rex Christopher
CPSO#:
52853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Matthews-Warren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2018
Corporation Name: B.A. Matthews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REX CHRISTOPHER WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1984 |