THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:36:38 PM
Greenwood, Julian David
CPSO#:
52837
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Julian Greenwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot St. W.
Leamington, ON. N8H 1N9
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor, ON N9A 1E1
Date Received: 09 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 25 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Julian David Greenwood to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2019:
Dr. Greenwood has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.