THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:34:36 AM
McCulloch, Janet Ruth
CPSO#:
52835
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
916 Princess Street
Kingston ON K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 531-6127
Fax: (613) 507-6127
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Janet R. McCulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANET RUTH MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1985 |