THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:38:53 AM
Kassel, Robert Neil
CPSO#:
52809
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3575
Fax: (905) 721-6640
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL KASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1985 |