THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:01:33 PM
Gabel, Nancy Ann
CPSO#:
52804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0750
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NANCY ANN GABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Nov 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1996 |