THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:56:29 AM
Rogelstad, Michael Laverne
CPSO#:
52743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3-17 Frank St
Strathroy ON N7G 2R2
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 1, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 13, 2022, Middlesex Hospital Alliance notified the College, pursuant to the Public Hospitals Act and the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), that Middlesex Hospital Alliance suspended Dr. Michael Rogelstad’s hospital privileges effective December 1, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAVERNE ROGELSTAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGELSTAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1984 |