THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:52:06 PM
Arnold, Cynthia Elaine
CPSO#:
52741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON N7V 4G6
Phone: 519-337-4627
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cynthia Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Arnold's family practice charts are with Dr. Akinsipe at the address above.
481 London Road
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Tele: 519 332 8822
Date Received: 27 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ELAINE ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1986 |