THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:47:37 AM
Jacobs, Irving Gene
CPSO#:
52707
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Radiology
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6182
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRVING GENE JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1989 |