THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:03:25 PM
Walter, Anthony John
CPSO#:
52700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Office
Royal Bank Plaza Medical Centre
PO Box 134
200 Bay St., Unit LR8
Toronto ON M5J 2J3
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:02 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:19 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN WALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1985 |