THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:12:11 PM
Agate, William Arthur
CPSO#:
52689
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883- 121
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can call The Health Centre of Maple at 905 - 832 - 3838 ext 1
Date Received: 23 Aug 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ARTHUR AGATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGATE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 1986 |