THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:14:39 PM
Thibert, Mark Roger
CPSO#:
52676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1077 Golf Links Rd.
Unit 4
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A3
Phone: (807) 346-5939
Fax: (807) 346-5497
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK ROGER THIBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 22, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)