THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:16:50 PM
Hobson, John William
CPSO#:
52673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
73 Delhi Street
Suite 302
Guelph ON N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 822-4521
Fax: (519) 822-0030
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph |
Guelph |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM HOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2009 to 03 Apr 2009
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1989 |