THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:03:01 PM
Cobourn, Christopher Stanley
CPSO#:
52668
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C.S. Cobourn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 22, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Stanley Cobourn to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 22, 2023:
College investigations were conducted into Dr. Cobourn’s care of two patients in his general surgery practice. In the face of the investigations, Dr. Cobourn resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)