THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:19:58 PM
Deketele, Anthony Gabriel
CPSO#:
52665
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
440 Browns Line
Etobicoke ON M8W 3T9
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A.G. Deketele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Apr 2023 |