THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:16:31 AM
Hillen, James McLaren
CPSO#:
52649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
552 Princess St
Addiction and Mental Health Service
Kingston ON K7L 1C7
Phone: 6134836116
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES MCLAREN HILLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1985 |