THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:22:16 PM
Koczerginski, David
CPSO#:
52636
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8 North, 812C
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6319
Fax: 416 756 6080
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID KOCZERGINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCZERGINSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1984 |