THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:13:14 PM
Macleod, Tara Lee
CPSO#:
52634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 690-6017
Fax: (416) 690-8052
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARA LEE MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Sep 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1985 |