THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:20:26 PM
Whiting, Wilma Georgene
CPSO#:
52620
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3237
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILMA GEORGENE WHITING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1987 |