THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:12:15 AM
Sullivan, Patrick Joseph
CPSO#:
52614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Rm B310, PO Box 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1985 |