THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:59:54 PM
Grimard, Laval Jacques
CPSO#:
52592
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Laval Grimard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Date Received: 11 Feb 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:04 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2022 |