THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:46:37 PM
Beaulieu, Joseph Andre Marc
CPSO#:
52578
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
Room 1018. Address Locator 6201C
100 Colonnade
K1A 0K9
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 941-6067
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ANDRE MARC BEAULIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAULIEU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1987 |