THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:49:40 AM
Vincent, George Manuel Ferreira
CPSO#:
52561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
234-Sunnyside Wing West
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6773
Fax: (416) 530-6184
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE MANUEL FERREIRA VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Sep 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1991 |