THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:01:36 AM
Leyland, Nicholas Albert
CPSO#:
52555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76696
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALBERT LEYLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEYLAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1986 |